PENGUIN COLLECTORS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education by encouraging & promoting the study of and research into the design, history and content of twentieth century printed books and other art, particularly paperback books and books and art published by Penguin Books Limited and by Sir Allen Lane; second the preservation of archive and similar historical material in public collections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 September 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Lloyd Davidson | Chair | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Louise McAteer | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Muireann Mary Maguire | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Paul David Lickiss | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Eifion Bedford | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Anthony Richard Mulcare | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jean Maddison | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIM GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES DOUGLAS MACKAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.86k | £18.97k | £11.52k | £21.32k | £30.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.87k | £12.26k | £8.06k | £13.33k | £17.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 13 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 30 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 13 OCTOBER 2007. as amended on 22 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE DESIGN, HISTORY AND CONTENT OF PRINTED BOOKS AND OTHER ART IN THE TWENTIETH CENTURY, PARTICULARLY PAPERBACK BOOKS AND BOOKS AND ART PUBLISHED BY PENGUIN BOOKS LIMITED AND BY SIR ALLEN LANE, (PLEASE SEE COPY OF THE SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON FILE FOR DETAILS).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 EAST STREET
OXFORD
OX2 0AU
- Phone:
- 01865 247897
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window