HEALING STREAMS CHURCH OF GOD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and advance the gosple of Jesus Christ by preaching and teaching in church and in the community and preparing members for Christian services to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 January 2002: Standard registration
- 30 August 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 30/09/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.27k | £10.13k | £61.26k | £11.23k | £21.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.16k | £12.30k | £2.70k | £15.52k | £72.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 10TH DAY OF SEPTEMBER 2001 AND AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21ST DECEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window