ST GEORGE'S LUPSET LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities seek to the local community through a range of services which assist the regeneration within an area of disadvantage; main activities include pre school and after school childcare,adult learning and health promotion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£1,533,138
Donations and legacies | £467.18k | |
Charitable activities | £940.54k | |
Other trading activities | £116 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £125.30k |
Total expenditure:
£1,640,477
Raising funds | £520 | |
Charitable activities | £1.64m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £56,914 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £520 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.64m |
People

65 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 24 October 2002: Standard registration
- ST GEORGE'S COMMUNITY PROJECT (Working name)
- LUPSET COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MIKE HOLT | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Dawn Kilburn | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Roy Edward Ernest Jackman | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Irvine Mc Gill | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
ANN ELIZABETH TOSTA | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
Christopher Peter Marsden Brown | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Viv Hughes | Trustee | 05 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
EDWARD JOSEPH WOODHOUSE | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL TATTERSALL | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|||||||
FREDA JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.17m | £1.21m | £1.40m | £1.52m | £1.53m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.21m | £1.27m | £1.36m | £1.42m | £1.64m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £454.92k | £449.71k | £219.01k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £523.56k | £104.21k | £200.65k | £161.27k | £56.91k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £127.20k | £223.73k | £431.84k | £525.93k | £467.18k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £824 | £0 | £0 | £512 | £116 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £902.37k | £756.92k | £872.88k | £888.88k | £940.54k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £143.45k | £226.26k | £95.65k | £108.17k | £125.30k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.21m | £1.08m | £1.36m | £1.42m | £1.64m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £281 | £262 | £0 | £0 | £520 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.02k | £5.74k | £5.78k | £6.42k | £6.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £196.67k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £452.13k | £407.87k | £369.78k | £338.77k | £321.62k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £364.17k | £352.52k | £458.88k | £559.46k | £470.53k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £46.58k | £58.05k | £83.78k | £46.59k | £47.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 July 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 July 2020 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/09/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/02/2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LUPSET AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATION IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LUPSET AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST GEORGES COMMUNITY PROJECT
BROADWAY
LUPSET
WAKEFIELD
WEST YORKSHIRE
WF2 8AA
- Phone:
- 01924369631
- Email:
- info@stgeorgeslupset.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window