RAINWORTH VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Manage Rainworth Village Hall for the benefit all all the residents of Rainworth and its environs no matter which District Council they may be under
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £2,400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 May 2002: Standard registration
- RAINWORTH VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- RAINWORTH VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Perry | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell Draycott | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Wilford | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.45k | £114.04k | £67.44k | £131.27k | £182.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.44k | £119.21k | £69.04k | £113.01k | £160.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.31k | £17.55k | £2.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 April 2023 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 April 2023 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JULY AS AMENDED ON 30 JANUARY 2002 AND 07 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF RAINWORTH AND ENVIRONS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING THE USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
RAINWORTH AND ENVIRONS, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rainworth Village Hall
Kirklington Road
Rainworth
MANSFIELD
NG21 0JY
- Phone:
- 01623 490382
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window