WONDER YEARS CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In the UK, we raise awareness and funds for our work in The Gambia: advancing education; relieving sickness, promoting health; and relieving poverty by supporting the creation of sustainable livelihoods. We believe this is the key to enabling Gambians make a better future for themselves. We offer a hand up not a hand out through the development of strong partnerships in the UK and The Gambia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- The Gambia
Governance
- 01 November 2001: Standard registration
- Partnerships in The Gambia (Working name)
- WYCE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER SCOTT | Chair | 18 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Eileen Peace | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penny Darlington-Twibill | Trustee | 19 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Evans | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN MARSHALL | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Dunlop | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.22k | £6.43k | £6.70k | £6.93k | £4.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.60k | £8.41k | £11.85k | £4.96k | £7.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 OCTOBER 2001 as amended on 07 Sep 2020 as amended on 17 Sep 2020 as amended on 17 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to the following: a) To advance the education of the people of The Gambia b) To relieve sickness and promote the health of the people of The Gambia c) To relieve poverty in The Gambia by supporting the creation of sustainable livelihoods.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Delves Crescent
Walsall
WS5 4LS
- Phone:
- 01922663014
- Email:
- admin@pingambia.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window