TIFFIN GIRLS MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of Tiffin Girls' School in Music by the provision of and assistance in the provision of grants and payments to cover and assist in covering the cost of musical instruments, concerts, tours and other expenses relating to the study of music that the trustees may from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 12 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adeniyi Odumboni | Chair | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Faith Yovan | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Hang Shu | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sofia Gueorgieva | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carmen Eneida Lozano Rios | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Lyall | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lopamudra Saha-Deftereos | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor TOBY WISEMAN | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Kate McClure | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Robert Owen | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Narissa Bowles | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Rachel Foster | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.19k | £5.28k | £8.11k | £9.03k | £8.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.63k | £10.73k | £1.92k | £3.71k | £7.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH NOVEMBER 2001 AND AMENDED 22ND JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF TIFFIN GIRLS' SCHOOL IN MUSIC, BY THE PROVISION OF AND ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND PAYMENTS TO COVER AND ASSIST IN COVERING THE COST OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS, CONCERTS, TOURS AND OTHER EXPENSES RELATING TO THE STUDY OF MUSIC THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON-UPON-THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tiffin Girls School
Richmond Road
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Surrey
KT2 5PL
- Phone:
- 02085460773
- Email:
- rachel@retsof.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window