PUDDLEDUCKS PRE-SCHOOL (WORKSOP)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an early years education provider for childre aged 2 to 5 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 05 February 2002: Standard registration
- GATEFORD EARLY YEARS (Previous name)
- PUDDLEDUCKS PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amie Bowler Ms | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Bramford | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Gee | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Marrison | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Taylor | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Rodgers | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Marrison | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Barber-Rice | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN RICHARDSON | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.64k | £67.31k | £120.01k | £128.57k | £115.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.20k | £70.50k | £113.46k | £119.66k | £118.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 June 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 07 June 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 October 2014
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Bassetlaw Family Hub
Raymoth Lane
Worksop
S81 7LU
- Phone:
- 01909 738707
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window