Financial history FRIENDS OF SOUTHFIELD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1091288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.97k £6.13k £2.20k £3.22k £1.85k
Total expenditure £957 £1.05k £311 £480 £4.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A