ROOK LANE ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1089605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion and fostering of education and appreciation of the Arts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £118
Total expenditure: £2,493

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN ERIC BELFORT BAX MBE Chair 12 November 2012
None on record
Adam Charles Laughton Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Victoria Dawn Allison Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
JAMES GARE Trustee 19 February 2018
DOROTHY HOUSE
Received: On time
Martin Wade Trustee 03 March 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.08k £0 £641 £10.87k £118
Total expenditure £1.94k £679 £771 £9.96k £2.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rook Lane Chapel
Bath Street
FROME
BA11 1DN
Phone:
01373468040