SYD UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SYD UK Limited has been formed as a religious trust, with the object of advancing its work in accordance with the principles of the Siddha Yoga tradition, in particular through the propagation on the teachings of Swami Muktananda and Swami Chidvilasananda
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhenu Selli | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Overy | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Whitehorn | Trustee | 04 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.43k | £119.11k | £39.28k | £53.19k | £91.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.10k | £93.76k | £47.17k | £42.78k | £85.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 DECEMBER 2001 AND WRITTEN RESOLUTION PASSED ON 4TH DECEMBER 2003. as amended on 23 Aug 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PRINCIPLES OF THE SIDDHA YOGA TRADITION IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROPAGATION OF THE TEACHINGS OF SWAMI MUKTANANDA PARAMAHANSA AND SWAMI CHIVILASANANDA AND TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Power Accountax Ltd
Mailbox 3
Solent Business Centre
343 Millbrook West
Southampton
- Phone:
- 0300 7729629
- Email:
- trustees@syduk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window