THE FEMINIST REVIEW TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust exists to support the following objectives: 1. to advance the education of the public in the subject of gender 2. to promote equality of opportunity 3. to alleviate poverty and hardship 4. other charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Camden
- Islington
- Liverpool City
- Luton
- Tower Hamlets
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Cuba
- Greece
- Peru
- Poland
- South Africa
- Switzerland
Governance
- 06 July 2005: Standard registration
- 19 February 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.23k | £11.46k | £3.29k | £86 | £262 | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.15k | £52.76k | £59.61k | £17.24k | £11.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
2.2.1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF GENDER BY CARRYING OUT AND / OR ASSISTING THE RESEARCH AND STUDY INTO THE SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND LEGAL POSITION OF WOMEN IN SOCIETY AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND STUDY. 2.2.2) TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY AND HARDSHIP BY PROMOTING AND ADVANCING GOOD HEALTH AND EDUCATION AMONGST WOMEN IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD. 2.2.3) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN WOMEN AND MEN IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD. 2.2.4) TO UNDERTAKE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES. 2.3) THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window