Financial history JIMMY MAC'S (ACTIVITY CENTRE FOR THE RETIRED AND DISABLED)

Charity number: 1091747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £179.86k £124.79k £191.31k £156.17k £188.33k
Total expenditure £161.10k £89.50k £140.02k £148.13k £141.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £70.36k £123.33k £6.84k £95.56k £98.58k