FANT WILDLIFE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
community & conservation wildlife group/nature reserve
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 11 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Adkinson | Chair | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rebecca Spain | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
COUNCILLOR PAUL HARPER | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Kevin Ian Herrington | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Diane Frewer | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
JOHN CALLAGHAN | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
PATRICK FREDERICK COATES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.18k | £389 | £643 | £990 | £5.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.46k | £566 | £897 | £2.23k | £1.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 3RD MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED ON 21 JUN 2023
Charitable objects
1) TO CONSERVE THE ENVIRONMENT, MAINLY USING VOLUNTEERS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC 2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF CONSERVATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 Upper Fant Road
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME16 8DN
- Phone:
- 01622320580
- Email:
- info@fantwildlife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window