Accounts and annual returns THE EAST DEVON CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1090156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 15 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 15 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required