THE LEAGUE AGAINST CRUEL SPORTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The League Against Cruel Sports works to expose and bring to an end the cruelty inflicted on animals in the name of sport by raising awareness, lobbying & campaigning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,943,830
Donations and legacies | £2.79m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £106.75k | |
Investments | £51.68k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,476,784
Raising funds | £452.81k | |
Charitable activities | £2.02m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £752 from 8 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £452.81k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.02m | |
Retained for future use | £467.05k |
People

42 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
155 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 January 2003: Standard registration
- 12 September 2023: Funds received from 1190643 GLOBAL WILDLIFE PROTECTION TRUST
- THE LEAGUE TRUST WORKING FOR WILDLIFE (Working name)
- THE LEAGUE TRUST (Previous name)
- WORKING FOR WILDLIFE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Moulding | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Carter | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Viktoria Petrova | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Fiona Brown | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Astrid Clifford | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.90m | £3.25m | £3.10m | £2.90m | £2.94m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.24m | £3.03m | £3.14m | £3.49m | £2.48m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £143.35k | £67.62k | £1.15k | £752 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.70m | £3.09m | £2.94m | £2.74m | £2.79m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £179.71k | £138.49k | £139.69k | £143.07k | £106.75k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £17.84k | £27.62k | £15.15k | £19.54k | £51.68k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.56m | £1.80m | £1.65m | £1.56m | £1.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.90m | £2.67m | £2.76m | £3.09m | £2.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £339.78k | £361.88k | £381.37k | £403.15k | £452.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £60.96k | £49.67k | £19.62k | £28.39k | £55.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.70m | £1.67m | £1.66m | £1.63m | £1.62m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.63m | £2.81m | £2.68m | £2.10m | £2.59m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £288.09k | £209.98k | £127.76k | £106.70k | £110.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/04/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 APR 2019
Charitable objects
1.1 THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE: 1.1.1 THE PREVENTION OF ALL FORMS OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS; 1.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GENERALLY WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF ANIMALS, ECOLOGY, NATURAL HISTORY, CONSERVATION AND ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES; 1.1.3 THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND RESTORATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE NATURAL RESOURCES, NATURAL BEAUTY AND ANIMAL AND PLANT LIFE OF THE WORLD AND LANDS AND BUILDINGS OF BEAUTY, HISTORIC INTEREST OR OF ECOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE AND, AS REGARDS LANDS, FOR THE PRESERVATION, AS FAR AS PRACTICABLE, OF THEIR NATURAL ASPECT, FEATURES AND ANIMAL AND PLANT LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
League Against Cruel Sports
New Sparling House
Holloway Hill
GODALMING
GU7 1QZ
- Phone:
- 01483524250
- Email:
- admin@league.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window