Financial history THE SONS OF DIVINE PROVIDENCE

Charity number: 1088675
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £2.65m £2.27m £1.75m £8.67m £6.70m
Total expenditure £2.57m £2.81m £2.15m £8.10m £5.29m
Income from government contracts £855.69k £663.33k £490.98k £100.18k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.56k £162.37k £9.38k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £394.15k £203.24k £214.30k £182.50k £82.92k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £6.94m £5.62m
Income - Charitable activities £2.17m £2.00m £1.46m £1.46m £861.56k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £58.59k £0
Income - Investment £75.91k £75.19k £74.43k £81.12k £0
Income - Other £2.82k £0 £0 £0 £134.51k
Income - Legacies £340.07k £128.64k £726 £0 £7.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.57m £2.79m £2.15m £2.62m £1.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.06k £15.41k £2.89k £1.83k £5.47k
Expenditure - Governance £23.94k £32.55k £53.77k £155.98k £155.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.47k
Expenditure - Other £0 £4.36k £0 £5.48m £3.42m