THE SONS OF DIVINE PROVIDENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sons of Divine Providence is a Catholic religious Congregation and charity. In the UK the charity provides housing and care services to people with learning disabilities and people who are elderly. The charity provides two care homes, 16 designated supported housing units, 63 units of social housing and a retreat centre. The charity also funds overseas missions of the Congregation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£6,700,136
Donations and legacies | £82.92k | |
Charitable activities | £861.56k | |
Other trading activities | £5.62m | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £134.51k |
Total expenditure:
£5,285,875
Raising funds | £5.47k | |
Charitable activities | £1.86m | |
Other | £3.42m |
-£250,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.42m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.86m | |
Retained for future use | £1.41m |
People

30 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Lancashire
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
- Bangladesh
- India
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Philippines
- Tanzania
- Togo
- Zambia
Governance
- 28 September 2001: Standard registration
- ORIONE CARE (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jose Luis Simionato | Chair | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Estanislao Mroz | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Joseph Wilson | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Olutade Olalekan | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Graham Clark | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev STEPHEN PETER BEALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev PHILIP KEHOE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.65m | £2.27m | £1.75m | £8.67m | £6.70m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.57m | £2.81m | £2.15m | £8.10m | £5.29m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £855.69k | £663.33k | £490.98k | £100.18k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.56k | £162.37k | £9.38k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £394.15k | £203.24k | £214.30k | £182.50k | £82.92k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.94m | £5.62m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.17m | £2.00m | £1.46m | £1.46m | £861.56k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £58.59k | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £75.91k | £75.19k | £74.43k | £81.12k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £2.82k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £134.51k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £340.07k | £128.64k | £726 | £0 | £7.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.57m | £2.79m | £2.15m | £2.62m | £1.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.06k | £15.41k | £2.89k | £1.83k | £5.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £23.94k | £32.55k | £53.77k | £155.98k | £155.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £4.36k | £0 | £5.48m | £3.42m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.42m | £9.77m | £6.06m | £7.08m | £1.15m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.53m | £1.29m | £1.33m | £1.39m | £8.43m | |
|
Other assets | £1.26m | £714.87k | £13.42m | £16.12m | £15.36m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.41m | £5.49m | £14.96m | £18.72m | £18.42m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 February 2025 | 384 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 February 2025 | 384 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/2002 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/12/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH BY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AND IN PARTICULAR SANCTIFY ALL MEMBERS OF THE CONGREGATION (AS DEFINED IN ARTICLE 1) THROUGH THE OBSERVANCE OF THE THREE SIMPLE VOWS OF OBEDIENCE, CHASTITY AND POVERTY AND OF THE CONSTITUTIONS OF THE CONGREGATION. 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY AND DISTRESS, AS A WAY OF GIVING PRACTICAL EXPRESSION TO THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH, BY PROVIDING CARE, HOUSING, RESPITE AND DAY SERVICES TO: PEOPLE WHO ARE SICK; YOUNG PEOPLE; PEOPLE WHO ARE ELDERLY; PEOPLE WITH MENTAL DISABILITIES; PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES; HOMELESS PEOPLE; PEOPLE IN HOUSING NEED 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING SCHOOLS, TRAINING CENTRES AND OTHER INSTITUTES OF LEARNING. 4. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY ARE DEMANDED BY THE NECESSITIES OF THE TIMES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 LOWER TEDDINGTON ROAD
HAMPTON WICK
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT1 4EU
- Phone:
- 02089775130
- Email:
- info@orionecare.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window