PUNJABI CHARITABLE SOCIETY LEICESTER UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEICESTER IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TUITION IN BOTH ENGLISH AND PUNJABI. 2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST AND SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF LEICESTER. 3. RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST INHABITANTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 09 May 2006: Standard registration
- 17 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PUNJABI CHARITABLE SOCIETY LEICESTER (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2011 | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.94k | £268 | £1.24k | £205 | £52 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.08k | £1.47k | £935 | £205 | £205 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 APRIL 2006.
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEICESTER IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TUITION IN BOTH ENGLISH AND PUNJABI. 2 TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST AND SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF LEICESTER. 3 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF LEICESTER.
Area of benefit
LEICESTER.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window