Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF TUDOR COURT ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1089045
Charity reporting is up to date (201 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 January 2025 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 17 January 2025 201 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 October 2024 483 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 October 2024 483 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 November 2022 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 February 2021 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required