FRIENDS OF TUDOR COURT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for our local school and its pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Thurrock
Governance
- 25 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Foakes | Chair | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Inga Ryan | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Ryan | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Micarla Danielle Byrne | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Kyriacou | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.20k | £7.45k | £12.63k | £34.21k | £38.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.35k | £14.72k | £2.73k | £24.40k | £24.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 201 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 October 2024 | 483 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 October 2024 | 483 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 February 2021 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE PUPILS OF TUDOR COURT C.P. SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tudor Court Primary School
Bark Burr Road
GRAYS
RM16 6PL
- Phone:
- 07931502362
- Email:
- kerryballard@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window