WALTHAM FOREST SOMALI BRAVANESE ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 1093755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide Advice, information and guidance to the somali and bravanese Community in Waltham Forest and surrounding boroughs. We also run Football Club project to the Somali youth in Waltham Forest as well as outreach services to GP's and Hospitals. Moreover we are member of the MASC ( Multi-lingual Advice Service Consortium).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £400
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Haringey
  • Redbridge
  • Waltham Forest

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SOMALI BRAVANESE ACTION GROUP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SAID ABUBAKAR AWEYS Treasurer Chair
TAIBA COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
Mohamed Jeilani Sufi Ba-Alawi Trustee 17 October 2014
None on record
MUNYE AHMED ABRAR Trustee 06 September 2014
None on record
HABIB ALWY MUNYE Trustee
None on record
OMAR SHEIKH MOHAMED Trustee
None on record
KHADRA OMAR SHEIKH Trustee
None on record
ABDALLA HABIB ALWI Trustee
None on record
OMAR AHMED ABOOKE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.11k £0 £500 £100 £400
Total expenditure £4.08k £100 £2.25k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
702 HIGH ROAD LEYTON
LONDON
E10 6JP
Phone:
02085586928
Website:

w.f.somalibrava'hotmail.com