Accounts and annual returns PARAYHOUSE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1090757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 13 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 13 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 12 September 2023 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 August 2022 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 August 2022 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 August 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 August 2021 40 days late Download Open in new window