Financial history PARAYHOUSE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1090757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.72m £1.81m £1.68m £1.80m £1.88m
Total expenditure £1.31m £1.51m £1.66m £1.79m £1.77m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £533.00k N/A
Income from government grants £698.00k £614.08k £628.34k £702.91k £194.64k
Income - Donations and legacies £704.52k £614.74k £629.19k £702.91k £58
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £972.34k £1.12m £954.37k £1.02m £1.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.00k £1.71k £5.49k £6.19k £43.75k
Income - Other £37.60k £79.94k £92.01k £69.80k £83.61k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £867.31k £1.02m £1.66m £1.79m £1.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £149.16k £157.11k £0 £193.83k £199.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £446.34k £488.73k £0 £0 £0