THE VAIL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charities objects are to maintain, support or contribute towards such one or more exclusively charitable purposes or charitable companies, institutions, associations, trusts or societies in the United Kingdom or elsewhere in the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £631.08k | £304.29k | £469.33k | £87.12k | £98.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20m | £1.35m | £1.08m | £521.98k | £4.07m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £510.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £121.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.14m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £56.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £16.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.12m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £56.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 10 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 10 July 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO MAINTAIN, SUPPORT OR CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS SUCH ONE OR MORE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE COMPANIES, INSTITUTIONS, ASSOCIATIONS, TRUSTS OR SOCIETIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window