FRIENDS OF CLOVER COURT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide outings and transport for people with disabilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Suffolk
Governance
- 25 June 2002: Standard registration
- 12 July 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1187285 WISH LIST BIKERS CHARITY
- FRIENDS OF SHAFTSBURY COURT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £674 | £2.26k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.21k | £2.40k | £533 | £533 | £620 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 21ST MAY 2002. as amended on 20 Nov 2018 as amended on 13 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") IN LOWESTOFT. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF CLOVER COURT, LOWESTOFT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES".
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK - LOWESTOFT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window