ESSEX MEDIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of mediation services for families in conflict. Essex mediation also works with Local authority offering mediation skills to those in need within the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2016
Total income includes £77,033 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 May 2002: Standard registration
- 08 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £408.54k | £370.95k | £288.04k | £319.52k | £287.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £427.15k | £399.86k | £327.51k | £324.52k | £314.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £92.73k | £77.03k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 14 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | 14 June 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 14 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | 30 June 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 03 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2014
(These accounts |
21 August 2015 | 22 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 12TH SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16TH JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO ALLEVIATE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAK-UP OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY INCLUDING ASSISTING COUPLES TO RESOLVE FAMILY DISPUTES AND REACH AGREED DECISIONS OF MATTERS ARISING FROM FAMILY STRESS, ESPECIALLY WITH REGARD TO CHILDREN".
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window