THE FLYING GORILLAS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education, understanding and appreciation of the public, in particular children, in various aspects of the performance of music and dance theatre. To enable children, including those from disadvantaged backgrounds, to participate in the arts and experience excellence. To celebrate the beauty and truth within people and things normally considered imperfect or worthless.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of Westminster
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Argentina
- Finland
- Germany
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Italy
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Maldives
- Nepal
- Northern Ireland
- Romania
- Samoa
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Slovenia
- Sri Lanka
- Thailand
- Turkey
Governance
- 15 November 2001: Standard registration
- 13 January 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 13 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1037607 PEDALLING ARTS LIMITED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.08k | £240.56k | £198.33k | £199.17k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.21k | £214.85k | £187.90k | £227.99k | £2.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £14.75k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.97k | £129.15k | £12.09k | £85.54k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2021 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2021 | 360 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH JULY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ART OF DANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window