WASTE NOT WANT NOT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the effects of poverty and social deprivation in North Wiltshire by collecting unwanted furniture and domestic appliances and redistributing them to individuals and families who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 20 November 2001: Standard registration
- WNWN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Henry Joseph Legrand | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Forster | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie-Ann Butt | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dennis Nation | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Loud | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN ANN Marigold Jackson | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.19k | £165.73k | £115.89k | £133.86k | £218.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.75k | £117.67k | £131.68k | £131.15k | £183.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY AND SOCIAL DEPRIVATION IN NORTH WILTSHIRE BY COLLECTING UNWANTED FURNITURE AND DOMESTIC APPLIANCES AND REDISTRIBUTING THEM TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AD DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NORTH WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
303 Hungerdown Lane
Chippenham
SN14 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01249447140
- Email:
- wnwn303@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window