Trustees THE FELL PONY SOCIETY
Charity number: 1104945

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER BOUSTEAD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Metcalfe | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Chadwick | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Blanche Grealish | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Turner | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Gilmour Mawrey | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Jane Whitley | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Evan George Lloyd | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Ernest Greener | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE LOUISE RAWDEN | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Jane Brunskill | Trustee | 02 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wales Bell | Trustee | 28 March 2015 |
|
|||||
CLAIRE EVELYN SIMPSON | Trustee | 29 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN AUDREY WALKER | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE SUSAN MILLARD | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HEATHER ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE HENRY BARRY MALLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM SYDNEY POTTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW THORPE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.