SPEAK OUT IN HOUNSLOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Speak Out in Hounslow is a user led, charitable organisation based in Hounslow providing services to people with learning disabilities and/or autism. We run activities including fitness, learning, a campaign project, social outings, volunteering opportunities, drama/music project, consultation and learning disability awareness services for organisations and companies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £99,631 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hounslow
Governance
- 08 January 2002: Standard registration
- SOH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOE JOHNSON | Chair | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jatinder Chohan | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ramandeep Mann | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ali Shah | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Punam Sharma | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sean Douglas Wienand | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Miller | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Joseph Power | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.77k | £192.37k | £189.21k | £209.90k | £306.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.41k | £183.86k | £199.57k | £220.42k | £241.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £70.65k | £69.46k | £69.46k | £69.61k | £99.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW (B) TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
HOUNSLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2.03
QWEST
1110 Great West Road
BRENTFORD
TW8 0GP
- Phone:
- 07949076062
- Email:
- nick@speakoutinhounslow.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window