THE MAGGIE KESWICK JENCKS CANCER CARING CENTRES TRUST (CAMBRIDGE)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DORMANT SUBSIDIARY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 05 March 2004: Standard registration
- 17 July 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 17 July 2009: Funds transferred to 700784 MAGGIE KESWICK JENCKS CANCER CARING CENTRES TRUST ...
- MAGGIE'S CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 14 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 16 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 31 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 19 December 2006 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 14 December 2005 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTIONS DATED 27 MAY 2002 AND 16 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
SUCH OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE CANCER OR HAVE SUFFERED CANCER, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS AND THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR AMONG SUCH PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ASSISTANCE AND ADVICE
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window