KENT SEARCH AND RESCUE (LOWLAND)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist in the relief of suffering and distress among persons endangered by accidents or natural hazards in the lowland areas of Kent, particularly by providing adequate arrangements for the secure and efficient search and rescue of any person or persons so endangered.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
103 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 18 March 2002: Standard registration
- KENT SEARCH AND RESCUE (Working name)
- EAST KENT SEARCH AND RESCUE (LOWLAND) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Spickett | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Deadman | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Paul | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carl Hynes | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Heselwood | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry Doggett | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Tinham | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Mark Rist | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ayling | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Paul Kingman | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.51k | £116.32k | £103.43k | £80.23k | £76.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.11k | £98.71k | £83.02k | £87.59k | £90.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 27 JANUARY, 2002 AS AMENDED ON 16 FEBRUARY 2003. AS AMENDED ON 13/04/2015 AS AMENDED ON 29 JAN 2018 as amended on 29 Jan 2018 as amended on 27 Mar 2019 as amended on 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
3.1. The charity?s objects (?the objects?) are to:- 3.1.1. protect and preserve life and good health by the provision of qualified volunteer Search and Rescue personnel, teams and equipment to assist organisations involved in the search and / or rescue of missing, vulnerable, in need and high risk persons in the county of Kent including neighbouring Emergency Services, Crown and other Lowland Rescue Units to assist them in search and rescue operations within their respective regions. ; 3.1.2. the provision of programs and material to help prevent the need for Search and Rescue activity by means of education of the general public.
Area of benefit
KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
KENT SEARCH & RESCUE
c/o Kent Police Marine & Search Div
Coldharbour Outstation
London Road
AYLESFORD
ME20 7SL
- Phone:
- 01233800165
- Email:
- secretary@ksar.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window