Financial history GUILD OF SCHOLARS TRUST

Charity Number: 1090791
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £1.09k £1.79k £1.23k £1.10k £117
Total expenditure £1.73k £1.37k £340 £340 £270
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A