THE GUSTAV MAHLER SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The GUSTAV MAHLER SOCIETY offers members generous discounts on performances of Mahler's music and other concerts, regular copies of 'The Wayfarer' magazine, study days, music events, talks and Mahler-related study tours. We provide a forum to consider the life and music of Gustav Mahler and other related composers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 May 2002: Standard registration
- THE GUSTAV MAHLER SOCIETY UK (Working name)
- THE GUSTAV MAHLER UK LTD (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Charles Raumann | Chair | 23 December 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Everall | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert Craig Ross | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|||||||||
DR JIM PRITCHARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.08k | £3.71k | £6.93k | £5.11k | £6.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.80k | £6.86k | £7.88k | £4.48k | £6.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 12TH SEPTEMBER 2001 AND AS AMENDED ON 26TH APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION THE MUSIC AND LIFE OF GUSTAV MAHLER AND ANY OTHER COMPOSER AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE (THE COMMITTEE) MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Whitelands Avenue
Chorleywood
RICKMANSWORTH
WD3 5RE
- Phone:
- 01923285312
- Email:
- info@mahlersociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window