THE VODAFONE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Vodafone Foundation is at the centre of a network of 28 global & local social investment programmes. Through this unique network, we are able to think & act locally & respond to the needs of the communities in which Vodafone operates. Globally, we harness the power of mobile technology to deliver long-term sustainable programmes that drive transformational change & support disaster response.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Albania
- Australia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Czech Republic
- Egypt
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Hungary
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Luxembourg
- Malta
- Mozambique
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Portugal
- Romania
- Scotland
- Spain
- Tanzania
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 04 December 2001: Standard registration
- 26 March 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 26 March 2024: Funds transferred to 1193984 VODAFONE FOUNDATION
- THE VODAFONE GROUP FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.15m | £18.30m | £15.96m | £17.33m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.90m | £17.23m | £16.04m | £22.83m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £20.58m | £0 | £15.95m | £17.29m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £458.88k | £223.21k | £11.74k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £17.93m | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £39.47k | £17.16k | £1.82k | £77 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £73.26k | £126.33k | £0 | £37.63k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £20.58m | £0 | £15.95m | £17.29m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £20.47m | £15.55m | £16.03m | £10.72m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £428.67k | £251.33k | £1.65k | £59.63k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £127.48k | £259.83k | £263.50k | £177.32k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £15.84m | £12.80m | £14.09m | £9.26m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £1.42m | £0 | £12.05m | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION OF 14 MARCH 2005 AND SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEED OF 10 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD FOR ALL PURPOSES THAT ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window