ST SEBASTIAN'S C OF E SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money for the St. Sebastian's Church of England Primary School and Nursery in Wokingham, Berkshire. We do this through a series of yearly events including the Summer Fayre, Christmas Bazaar, Sponsored Walks, Auction Evening, Light Parties, Book Sales, Cake Sales and other events. We work closely with the St. Sebastian's Church and the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wokingham
Governance
- 14 March 2002: Standard registration
- ST SEBASTIANS SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leao Flores | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deepika Augustine | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.59k | £296 | £5.72k | £3.39k | £9.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.15k | £3.91k | £3.21k | £2.61k | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 October 2021 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED 24 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE ST SEBASTIANS C OF E (AIDED) PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. SEBASTIANS PRIMARY SCHOOL
NINE MILE RIDE
WOKINGHAM
RG40 3AT
- Phone:
- 01344772427
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window