THE ANTHONY SHAW COLLECTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the Anthony Shaw Collection is to hold thematic displays of contemporary studio ceramics in its new home of York Art Gallery when it re opens in the spring of 2015. Loans are also made to national and international museums/exhibitions. An archive of the Collection is being built on-line and is available to view at www.anthonyshawcollection.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET BARNES | Trustee | 04 February 2014 |
|
|||||
DAVID GEOFFREY WHITING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TATJANA MARSDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.04k | £3.06k | £4.68k | £4.84k | £8.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.05k | £1.27k | £1.33k | £3.20k | £11.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND OCTOBER 2001 AND AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED EXECUTED ON THE 6TH FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ART, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE EXHIBITION OF A COLLECTION OF CERAMICS AND RELATED ART OBJECTS."
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
132 NORTH END ROAD
WEST KENSINGTON
LONDON
W14 9PP
- Phone:
- 02073855775
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window