RHODES BIRTHPLACE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rhodes houses a museum, auditorium, meeting rooms, dance studios and a cafe/bar area. The complex provides local access to the arts and facilities for a range of cultural activities including dance, theatre, education and cinema. The Bishop's Stortford Museum is a valuable educational resource and exhibits both African and local collections with occasional special displays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 January 2002: Standard registration
- 27 June 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 27 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1189853 BISHOP'S STORTFORD MUSEUM AND ARTS CIO
- RHODES CENTRE BIRTHPLACE TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06m | £1.18m | £802.86k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02m | £1.12m | £750.34k | £4.35m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £255.00k | £344.64k | £647.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £265.02k | £349.18k | £651.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £181.85k | £190.81k | £35.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £606.74k | £639.76k | £112.51k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.21k | £3.73k | £2.91k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £923.92k | £1.01m | £713.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £93.25k | £107.83k | £37.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.06k | £18.05k | £24.57k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO 1) ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY; A) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A MUSEUM KNOWN AS THE BISHOP'S STORTFORD MUSEUM ("THE MUSEUM") IN THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS' RHODES HOUSE' THE BIRTHPLACE OF CECIL JOHN RHODES (ALSO KNOWN AS (' NETTLESWELL HOUSE') AND 'THORLEY BOURNE' BISHOP'S STORTFORD HERTFORDSHIRE AND MAINTAINING AND PRESERVING THE SAID PROPERTIES; B) MAINTAINING THE MUSEUM AS PARTLY FURNISHED IN THE STYLE OF THE MID NINETEENTH CENTURY; C) MAINTAINING AT THE SAID PROPERTIES A LIBRARY A LOCAL MUSEUM AND AN ART GALLERY UNDER THE PUBLIC LIBRARIES ACTS; D) MAINTAINING AND SUPPORTING THE COLLECTIONS FORMERLY OF THE BISHOP'S STORTFORD LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY AND THE CECIL RHODES MEMORIAL MUSEUM TOGETHER WITH SUCH EXHIBITS AND ITEMS INCLUDING THE DEVELOPMENT OF A COLLECTION RELATING TO THE HISTORY OF SOUTHERN AFRICA AS MAY BE ACQUIRED FROM TIME TO TIME ("THE COLLECTION"); E) CONDUCTING AND PUBLISHING RESEARCH INTO THE LOCAL HISTORY OF BISHOP'S STORTFORD AND ITS DISTRICT AND/OR THE HISTORY OF SOUTHERN AFRICA; F) STAGING EXHIBITIONS DISPLAYS TALKS LECTURES VISITS AND EXCURSIONS; G) PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL SERVICES FOR SCHOOLS AND FOR LIFE LONG LEARNING. (II) TO USE SUCH PART OF THE SAID PROPERTIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT TO PROVIDE A PUBLIC HALL AND ROOMS ("THE HALL") FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BISHOP'S STORTFORD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF NATIONALITY SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS FOR MEETINGS LECTURES CLASSES PUBLIC PERFORMANCE AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS;
Area of benefit
HERTSFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window