MAAHADUS SHUHADA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maahadus Shuhada Trust is a worship place. It aims to foster an awareness within the community about their surroundings and society in an environment that is both conductive to their learning and moral welfare. The institute aims to install within its community with a sense of citizenship and prosperity for human welfare, value, plurailty and multiculturalism within society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 21 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHMED JUNED DESAI | Trustee | 19 December 2020 |
|
|||||
EBRAHIM DESAI | Trustee | 20 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
FAISAL MAHMOOD TIMOL | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ZAKARIA ISSACK DESAI | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHOEB DESAI | Trustee | 21 March 2002 |
|
|||||
HIFZURREHMAN HASSAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMED SHOEB AIYUB NAKHUDA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.84k | £239.84k | £128.46k | £69.59k | £42.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.43k | £48.69k | £38.66k | £46.32k | £54.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 January 2025 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 January 2025 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2024 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2024 | 317 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 March 2024 | 512 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 March 2024 | 512 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 December 2022 | 418 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 December 2022 | 418 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 March 2021 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 March 2021 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 24 JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF SUNNI ISLAM WHICH IS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE JURISTIC INTERPRETATION OF THE GRAND MUFTI OF DAROOL-ULOOM AL-ARABIYYA AL-ISLAMIYYAH, HOLCOMBE HALL, HOLCOMBE, BURY, LANCASHIRE. 2) TO FURTHER ISLAMIC EDUCATION INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF THE ARABIC LANGUAGE. 3) TO HELP EDUCATE YOUNG MUSLIMS SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 4) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ANY CHARITABLE SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maahadus Shuhada
214 Deepdale Road
PRESTON
PR1 6QB
- Phone:
- 01772460477
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window