HATTON PARK RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 14 January 2002: Standard registration
- H.P.R.A. (Working name)
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Neil Williams | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Veronica Chapman | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN INGA HAGUE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.01k | £25.25k | £46.94k | £24.32k | £23.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.23k | £15.06k | £21.27k | £28.67k | £30.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.20k | £11.33k | £29.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2023 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2023 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HATTON PARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS B) ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS C) PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE CHARACTER AND AMENITIES OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT D) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED
Area of benefit
HATTON PARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hatton Park Village Hall
Barcheston Drive
Hatton Park
WARWICK
CV35 7TR
- Phone:
- 01926403122
- Email:
- treasurer@hattonpark.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window