OLLERTON YOUTH PROJECT 2000
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 January 2002: Standard registration
- 14 October 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE OLLERTON YOUTH PROJECT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.98k | £69.43k | £51.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.96k | £78.74k | £54.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 13 February 2008 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 08 February 2008 | 100 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 05 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 05 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 29 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 29 September 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 5 FEBRUARY 2001 AND 26 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, AN OPPORTUNITY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITY THAT WILL ENABLE THEM TO RELATE BETTER TO EACH OTHER AND TO THE COMMUNITY IN WHICH THEY LIVE. THE AREA COVERED ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WILL BE THE ELECTORAL WARDS OF OLLERTON NORTH, OLLERTON SOUTH AND BOUGHTON.
Area of benefit
THE ELECTORAL WARDS OF OLLERTON NORTH, OLLERTON SOUTH AND BOUGHTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window