Trustees MACCLESFIELD U3A

Charity Number: 1089429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John McKellar Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Dr Steve Hodgskiss Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Phyllis Thomas Trustee 18 January 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Marion Grant Trustee 07 March 2022
None on record
MR Tony Middleton Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record