Trustees MOSS LANE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1089177

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Jupe | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Orchard-Murlewski | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Holliday | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Matias | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare Green | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Ann Worsfold | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Scott Courtney Worsfold | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Esther Jean McAllen | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.