Trustees ROTHERHAM & DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1089261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Celia Cashman Chair 08 September 2021
None on record
Hannah Khatib Trustee 30 September 2024
THE TALBOT TRUSTS
Received: On time
Oghogho Winnifred Idehen Trustee 29 July 2024
None on record
Anthony Griffin Trustee 29 July 2024
None on record
Krishna Harish Trustee 29 July 2024
None on record
Emma Louise Kaye Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
Ryan Coleflax Trustee 25 August 2022
None on record
Eleanor Dearle Trustee 07 September 2017
None on record