HILTINGBURY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RUN A COMMUNITY CENTRE THAT EMPHASISES THE HEART OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND ENABLE ITS HIRE FOR COMMUNITY AND OTHER ACTIVITIES. FACILITATE A WIDE RANGE OF LOCAL COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES AND ORGANISE AND RUN SOME ACTIVITIES. ACTIVELY ENGAGE AND MAINTAIN CLOSE LINKS WITH LOCAL AUTHORITY AND COMMUNITY GROUPS TO ENABLE THE PROVISION OF A WELL-BALANCED RANGE OF ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 26 November 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD LANSDOWNE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tajinder Singh Sohal | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|||||
DOREEN MARY RICHES | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER GERALD PAPE | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SHUTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOSEPH HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA MACBEAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN CHRISTOPHER HOUSHAM BSC DMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.00k | £41.00k | £63.21k | £109.00k | £119.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.00k | £72.00k | £69.21k | £96.71k | £137.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 2001, AS AMENDED 6 OCTOBER 2009 as amended on 08 Nov 2021 as amended on 08 Nov 2021 as amended on 08 Nov 2021 as amended on 08 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HILTINGBURY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY HILTINGBURY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION...
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF HILTINGBURY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hiltingbury Community Centre
Hiltingbury Road
Chandler's Ford
EASTLEIGH
SO53 5NP
- Phone:
- 023 8027 1609
- Email:
- enquiries@thehilt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window