CALVARY MINISTRIES (CAPRO MISSIONS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN THE UK/WORLD, WE MAKE CHRIST KNOWN VIA CROSS-CULTURAL MISSIONS, INTERNET EVANGELISM, SOCIAL MEDIA, FILMS, BIBLES, CDS, LITERATURE, DVDS,BOOKS, TRACTS, ETC. WE ARE #1 IN TRACT EVANGELISM IN THE OPEN AIR, HOSPITALS, PRISONS, ETC. ABROAD, CALVARY CHARITY NGO SUPPORTS PRISONS, ORPHANAGE HOMES, DEAF & DUMB & DISABLED PERSONS HOMES, LEPROSY MISSIONS, BLIND INSTITUTES, HOSPITALS, REFUGEE CAMPS, ETC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Benin
- Burkina Faso
- Congo
- France
- Ghana
- Guinea
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Nigeria
- Senegal
- South Africa
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Turkey
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 11 April 2003: Standard registration
- CALVARY CHARITY (Working name)
- CALVARY MINISTRIES UK (Working name)
- CALVARY MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gilbert Eruchalu Mr | Chair | 15 April 2003 |
|
|
||||
Esther Golibe Eruchalu | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hope Ebele Chiemelie Erus Pastor | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.40k | £9.78k | £5.44k | £7.13k | £9.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.65k | £5.75k | £600 | £500 | £2.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 December 2020 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 18 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY THE PROMOTION OF EVANGELISM THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY: (1) INCREASING AWARENESS FOR MISSIONS AND ENCOURAGING CHURCHES AND OTHER CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS TO JOINTLY REACH OUT TO THE UNREACHED NATIONS OF THE WORLD WITH THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL (2) ENCOURAGING UK CHURCHES AND ALL CHRISTIANS TO BE PROACTIVE MISSIONARY SUPPORTERS AND TO GIVE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO MISSION AGENCIES (3) MOBILISING TRAINING AND SUPPORTING PEOPLE IN CROSS CULTURAL MISSIONS TO REACH INDIVIDUALS OF NO FAITH AND OF OTHER FAITHS OR PERSUASIONS ESPECIALLY IN THE COUNTRIES OF EUROPE (4) GATHERING AND PROVIDING SUPPORT TO THE SUFFERING OR PERSECUTED CHURCH WORLD-WIDE AND PROVIDING AID TO THE LESS PRIVILEGED SUFFERING DISABLED AND SICK AMONG THE POOREST COMMUNITIES REGARDLESS OF THEIR RELIGIOUS ORIENTATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Moody Street
LONDON
E1 4BY
- Phone:
- 07958471224
- Email:
- Calvarycharity@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window