Accounts and annual returns THE NURSES WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1090021
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 02 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 12 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 20 October 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 11 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 11 August 2004 On Time