BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND LAW
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide education via occasional seminars to professionals and interested members of the public in the field of mental health and law
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 November 2001: Standard registration
- 12 September 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 12 September 2014: Funds transferred to 219830 MIND (THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH)
- BAMHL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £320 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15 | £390 | £14 | £14 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 14 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 23 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 23 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 02 August 2011 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING PROFESSIONALS INVOLVED IN THE DELIVERY OF MENTAL HEALTH CARE AND ASSOCIATED LEGAL SERVICES, BY IMPROVING THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE INTERACTION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND LAW, ENCOURAGING THE RECOGNITION OF ISSUES INVOLVING MENTAL HEALTH LAW AND PRACTICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window