AOUK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The further education and training of all those engaged in the treatment and care of the musculo skeletal system and to promote and co-ordinate clinical research in disorders of the musculo skeletal system and their treatment and to publish the results of such research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 27 March 2002: Standard registration
- 03 May 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 03 May 2022: Funds transferred to 1190596 AOUK & I
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.27m | £515.15k | £294.36k | £286.52k | £252.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.33m | £492.34k | £277.11k | £267.41k | £237.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £102.45k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.14m | £479.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £33.19k | £35.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.32m | £482.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £11.95k | £9.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.86k | £7.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £64.43k | £35.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £11.95k | £9.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 26 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 26 July 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25 FEBRUARY 2002 AND 21 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FOR OTHER PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: 1) THE FURTHER EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ALL THOSE ENGAGED IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF DISORDERS OF THE MUSCULO SKELETAL SYSTEM, 2) TO PROMOTE AND CO-ORDINATE CLINICAL RESEARCH IN ENGLAND AND WALES IN DISORDERS OF THE MUSCULO SKELETAL SYSTEM AND THEIR TREATMENT, AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window