MUSLIM WOMEN'S YOUTH, SPORT & EDUCATION FORUM, MERSEYSIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Muslim Womens Centre runs activities for women, children & young people: leisure, health & education: taking into account cultural, religious and other barriers preventing them using other facilities. We organise trips & cultural events and provide a setting for ESOL & basic skills; we offer study support & advocacy over educational matters, youth activities & health and healthy-living activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £23,000 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 16 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZEINAB MAHAMOUD YOUSEF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASLI HASHI AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Hayad Ibrahim | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.34k | £20.64k | £11.70k | £39.97k | £29.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80k | £7.01k | £15.59k | £48.76k | £30.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £23.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 November 2023 | 495 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 September 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 December 2020 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 27 FEBRUARY 2002 AND 27 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
A). TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 35 IN MERSEYSIDE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT"), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE OF MUSLIM FAITH, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Muslim Women's Centre
51 Granby Street
Liverpool
L8 2TU
- Phone:
- 01517350321
- Email:
- hayadibrahim@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window